Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jfs Curtze Foodservice, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Christin Filippelli, The Eatery On Franklin Inc. D B A The Eatery, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 23, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 29, 2022 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
November 29, 2022 | Affidavits of Compliance | ||
November 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION BCL Notice |
||
November 29, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 16, 2022 | ORDER - AWARDING FEE | ||
November 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation - Attorney's Fees |
||
November 15, 2022 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
November 15, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.