Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nandd V, David B Voorhees, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Quencer, Kathy L., Youngman, Heather Leigh, Deroberts, Jeffrey, against Morgan M Voorhees, represented by Taylor, Rafferty Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | ORDER - PROTECTION (TEMPORARY) | ||
December 15, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
December 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
December 05, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
December 02, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 02, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
November 29, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 10, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 10, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.