Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Eagle Ridge Housing Partners, Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Akarah, Amanie, Christie, Monica G., Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Jurek, Amber Augustine, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, (total of 9) See All against Aka Judith Depuy, Discover Bank, George H Depuy, Hayley Neurath, John Doe, (total of 7) See All represented by Sullivan, Debra Chini, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Pendency with deeds |
||
October 20, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Notice of Sale |
||
October 06, 2022 | RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) | ||
October 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
August 10, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SALE Reply to Answer |
||
August 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Notice of Sale |
||
August 05, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Strothers Answer |
||
July 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 20, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 30, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY for JFS Redacted per 22 NYCRR for JFS Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.