Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sarah Williamson, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bottar, Michael A., Ryder, Aaron J., against Carthage Area Hospital, Michael Kiger P.A., Riccardo Turrin M.D., St Lawrence Radiology Associates P C, Wade Swatsworth P.A., (total of 5) See All represented by Borelli, Andrew R., Coghlan, John Patrick, Dunn, Mark Lawrence, Johnson, Eric Gates, Sullivan, Christine Ann, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 30, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 30, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 30, 2022SUMMONS
Date: January 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: March 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 19, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 30, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 30, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: February 11, 2022SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: March 02, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 02, 2022STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: March 02, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 11, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE St Lawrence Radiology |
||
March 30, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
March 30, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Discovery |
||
March 30, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Social Media |
||
March 30, 2022 | Answer to Amended Complaint | ||
March 30, 2022 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
March 11, 2022 | Answer to Amended Complaint - Riccardo Turrin, M.D. | ||
March 08, 2022 |
ANSWER Defendant Carthage Area Hospital's Answer to Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2022 |
ANSWER Defendant Swatsworth's Answer to Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.