Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Paula J Bluteau, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 20, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
April 09, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
March 17, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 19, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.