Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with Gilbert, Hon. Hugh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert, Hon. Hugh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2015 |
CategorySp-Cplr Article 78 (Body Or Officer) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Held Gilbert (Hearing) Judge: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh |
|
March 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided Gilbert (Court Activity) Judge: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh |
|
March 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #001) Gilbert (Motion Part) Judge: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh |
|
March 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Gilbert (Motion Part) Judge: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh |
|
February 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Gilbert (Motion Part) Judge: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh |
|
January 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Gilbert (Motion Part) Judge: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh |
|
December 03, 2014 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/05/2015Decided Before Justice: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh Answer demanded: No Judge: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh |
|
December 03, 2014 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Gilbert (Motion Part) Judge: Gilbert, Hon. Hugh |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.