Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMc Clusky, Hon. James P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryMat-Contested |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time435 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2016 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
November 17, 2016 | Hearing |
Post-Settled Before Trial (Court Activity) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
August 31, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial Set For (Trial Part) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
August 31, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial Ended (Trial Part) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
July 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
June 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial Set For (Trial Part) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
May 31, 2016 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed (Court Activity) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
January 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) (Motion Part) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
|
January 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) (Motion Part) Judge: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.