Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, Plaza Home Mortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against John Doe, Kyle J Turner Aka, Kyle Turner Aka, in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
April 05, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
February 03, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit B Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 27, 2022 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
January 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit A Redacted |
||
January 27, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.