Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fulton Chain Land, Llc, Rivett'S Marine Recreation & Service, Inc., filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Locke, Merritt Sullivan, against Forged Holdings Llc, Justin Kline, Veronica Kline, represented by Devendorf, Jon Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with Mark R Rose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark R Rose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Quiet Title) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 18, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 18, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 18, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 07, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 13, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 13, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 18, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 18, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 02, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 07, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 23, 2022SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019)
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 18, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 18, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: May 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 05, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: May 18, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 07, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: December 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019)
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F *Corrected*
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: May 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 05, 2022ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: May 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: November 02, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 02, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 16, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 24, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) 9/30 letter to Laura Minnie |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Attorney Ayers' e-mail of 10/31 |
||
November 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4) Amended Affirmation |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
November 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #4) attachment to Attorney Affirmation |
||
November 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
November 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 26, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED (Motion #3) Extension to Discovery Deadlines |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.