Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
M And T Bank M & T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against John Doe, Sarah Mcdonald Aka, Sarah M Mcdonald Aka, Thomas E Mcdonald Iii Aka, Thomas Mcdonald Aka, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with Mark R Rose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark R Rose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 21, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 20, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 24, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 10, 2019CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: March 19, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 11, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 24, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 24, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 24, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 18, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 18, 2019COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: March 19, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #2) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 16, 2021JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: January 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 16, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: December 16, 2021ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: December 16, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 19, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 16, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 06, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 18, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 30, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 06, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 16, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 16, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 28, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 28, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 03, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE OF SALE
Date: May 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 28, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 13, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 29, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2) Surplus Monies Form Due |
||
June 29, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) filed by TSM |
||
June 13, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) extending time for sale |
||
May 26, 2023 |
NOTICE OF SALE Letter with NOS 104242-1 |
||
May 26, 2023 | proof of service 104242-1 | ||
May 03, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
May 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #3) filed by TSM |
||
April 28, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
April 28, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #3) Supporting Documents |
||
April 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) filed by TSM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.