Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Champion Mortgage Company Dba, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bhatia, Raspreet, Regina, Angelo Anthony, Wynn, Adam Seth, against Daniel Mangieri, Emily Mangieri, Estate Of Francis Rosario Mangieri, Estate Of Frank Mangieri, Francis Rosario Mangieri Iii, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 22, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
April 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
April 08, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
April 08, 2022 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
March 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
February 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
October 13, 2021 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.