Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with JOHN H CRANDALL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN H CRANDALL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2018 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) CRANDALL (Motion Part) Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
October 03, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT CRANDALL (Court Activity) Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
October 03, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) CRANDALL (Motion Part) Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
August 15, 2018 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SA (Motion #002) Decided: 10/03/2018GRANTED JFS; SIGNED AND OUT; F Before Justice: JOHN H CRANDALL Answer demanded: No Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
August 15, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) CRANDALL (Motion Part) Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
August 01, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) CRANDALL (Motion Part) Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
August 01, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) CRANDALL (Motion Part) Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
June 28, 2018 | Motion |
OOR GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 08/01/2018GRANTED OOR; OUT TO ATTNY. Before Justice: JOHN H CRANDALL Answer demanded: No Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
June 28, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) CRANDALL (Motion Part) Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
|
May 16, 2018 | Hearing |
CONTINUED CRANDALL (Settlement Conference) Judge: JOHN H CRANDALL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.