Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with HON. CHARLES C. MERRELL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. CHARLES C. MERRELL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2018 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT MERRELL, AJSC (Court Activity) Judge: HON. CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
February 14, 2018 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED MERRELL, AJSC (Court Activity) Judge: HON. CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
January 29, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL, AJSC (Motion Part) Judge: HON. CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
January 18, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL, AJSC (Motion Part) Judge: HON. CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
December 21, 2017 | Motion |
MOTION TO PROCEED AS POOR PERS (Motion #001) Decided: 01/29/2018GRANTED Before Justice: HON. CHARLES C. MERRELL Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
December 21, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MERRELL, AJSC (Motion Part) Judge: HON. CHARLES C. MERRELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.