Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Frank Haner, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 03, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 01, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
September 21, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COPY OF ADDITONAL NOTICE / MAILED OUT 09/22/2021 |
||
September 11, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 03, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64688414851 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.