Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Green Mountain Electric Supply Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Laurilliard, Kevin, against Iowa Wind And Solar Llc Dba, Michael Maranda, Michael Maranda Llc, Northway Mining Llc, Simpleray, (total of 6) See All represented by Campbell, Stephanie M., Keleher, Ryan Patrick, Neidl, Benjamin Fisher, Taglienti, James Michael, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Mott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 26, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2020APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: July 17, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 19, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 03, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 02, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 01, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 01, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 31, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: July 17, 2020SUMMONS
Date: July 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 01, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 02, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 28, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 02, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2021INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: October 15, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 02, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: August 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 20, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 17, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 05, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 16, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 05, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 17, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 01, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 10, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Scheduling Order |
||
February 10, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Updated Case Summary |
||
February 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) of James M. Taglienti, Esq. |
||
February 01, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
January 17, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 03, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
June 16, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.