Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Irbc Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Augustin, Hans Henry, Brennan, Jennifer R., Casey, Kathleen Ann, Rugino, Edward, against Deanna Karpe, Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-Emx9, Koz M Karpe, Mortage Kebders Betwork Usa Incorporated, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc Nominee, (total of 7) See All represented by Baer, Anthony Freund, Hartz, Gayle Elaine, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts with Adam W Silverman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam W Silverman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2019APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: August 15, 2019COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Stipulation to Adjourn Trial |
||
November 22, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
November 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #3) Bankruptcy PACER Docket Report |
||
November 21, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #3) Mortgage Statements Redacted per 22 NYCRR Mortgage Statements Redacted |
||
November 18, 2022 |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Stipulation to Adjourn Settlement Conference |
||
November 18, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED In-Person Conference Scheduled for November 23, 2022 adjourned to December 7, 2022 at 10:40 a.m. |
||
October 25, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
October 25, 2022 |
NOTICE Settlement Conferene |
||
October 18, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Stipulation to Adjourn Motion & Cross Motion Return date to 11/22/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.