Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Greene County. This case was filed in Greene County Superior Courts with GEORGE J. PULVER, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGEORGE J. PULVER, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2008 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2008 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PULVER, JR. (Prelim. Conference) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
May 01, 2008 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED PULVER, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
May 01, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
April 17, 2008 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
April 07, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
April 07, 2008 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) Decided: 05/01/2008GRANTED Before Justice: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR Answer demanded: No Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
February 20, 2008 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD PULVER, JR. (Hearing) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
February 20, 2008 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
February 20, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
February 05, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.