Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Timothy D Henry, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 30, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 16, 2023 | 202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE | ||
June 05, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
May 17, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
May 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-TIMOTHY D HENRY |
||
May 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-TIMOTHY D HENRY |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Cardmember Agreement |
||
January 30, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.