Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Mariner Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gitlin, Robert Brian, against Michael Shanley, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT
Date: May 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
May 01, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 25, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
April 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING |
||
April 25, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT OF FACT |
||
February 06, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
February 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 16, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.