Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
New City Funding Corp., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Shelby Abel, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
July 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 23, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
May 22, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
April 24, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
April 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SHELBY ABEL |
||
January 10, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT |
||
January 10, 2023 | Affidavit in Support of Complaint | ||
January 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit(s) |
||
January 10, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.