Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kenneth C Scott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mouganis, Emanuel Nicholas, against Carol L Scott, represented by Frazie, Tasha Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID) | ||
December 23, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
December 23, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 14, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
December 06, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 21, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.