Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Community Bank, N.A. S I I To Steuben Trust Company, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Amber R Silverheels, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 04, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
May 01, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 28, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
April 25, 2023 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) *Corrected* Signed |
||
March 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Filed Affidavit of Service |
||
March 10, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
March 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Military Search |
||
March 10, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
March 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Filed Summons & Complaint |
||
March 10, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) *Corrected* Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.