Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
James P Punch Attorney For Child, Ashley M. Kaluzny, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Punch, James Patrick, Bonarigo, Benjamin James, against Matthew D. Kaluzny, represented by Potts, Kellan Burton, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY FOR THE CHILD(REN) UCS880 | ||
January 26, 2023 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
January 04, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
January 04, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 28, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 12, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
December 12, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 15, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
November 15, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.