Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Michael J. Mcculley, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Whiting, John Fay, against Mcdonald'S, Mcdonald'S Corporation, Nexgen Ventures, Llc, represented by Procopio, Taylor Lindsay, Robinson, Lisa M, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 13, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Signed Stipulated Protective Order |
||
October 12, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 12, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 03, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER To sign Stipulated Protective Order |
||
September 30, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
September 30, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 19, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 12, 2022 | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.