Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Axos Bank Fka Bofi Federal Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Frieland, Harry, against Stephanie Ianita, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: September 13, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: July 29, 2022NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
August 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID) | ||
July 05, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
July 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Promissory Note |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.