Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Charles Messina Afc, Jose A. Cruz, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Custody) case represented by Messina, Charles A, Monte, Elaina Marie, against Amber L. Klehn, represented by Demo-Vazquez, Kristine M., in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Custody) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
|
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 06, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 07, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 19, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 01, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 28, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: June 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 28, 2022SUMMONS
Date: June 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulated Order of Custody and Visitation |
||
March 16, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulated Order |
||
August 01, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
July 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 10, 2022 | Proof of Service | ||
July 07, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Signed Order to Show Cause |
||
July 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of EFiling |
||
June 28, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
June 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint Exhibit A |
||
June 28, 2022 | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.