Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mariner Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gitlin, Robert Brian, against Kevin D. Wolff, represented by Williams, Gerald O., in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) AS PER COURT ORDER |
||
September 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION |
||
September 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A SUMMONS, COMPLAINT & AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
September 15, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D LICENSED LENDER DOCUMENTATION |
||
September 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C PAYOFF STATEMENT & RECORD OF PAYMENTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR PAYOFF STATEMENT & RECORD OF PAYMENTS Redacted |
||
September 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AFFIDAVIT OF FACT |
||
September 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.