Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
In The Matter Of Drb Capital, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Transfer Structure) case represented by Jensen, Donald W, against J. B., New York Life And Annuity Corporation, New York Life Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Transfer Structure) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
|
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: June 09, 2022PETITION
Date: June 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
||
August 03, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order |
||
August 02, 2022 |
NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) Amended Petition To Transfer Structure |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Unredacted Exh. D |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Unredacted Exh. C |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Unredacted Exh. B |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Unredacted Exh. A |
||
July 06, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
June 16, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Signed OTSC |
||
June 09, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.