Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Daniel J. Sion, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Laforce, Mary Kathryn, Wolf, Paul W., against Michelle L. Sion, represented by Pajak, David J., in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 07, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
March 07, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
March 02, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
February 22, 2023 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
February 22, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY | ||
February 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
February 22, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
February 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.