Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
John Strandberg, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Zekowski, Brett A, against Iroquois Trail Council Boy Scouts Of America, Inc., represented by Beckwith, Mathew William, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation |
||
November 24, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Order Approving Fifth Stipulation |
||
October 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 13, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.