Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Sheerin, John J, against Kim Ribbeck, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 30, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: October 19, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 30, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: September 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
October 19, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 30, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 30, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 30, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
August 13, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
August 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 23, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT KIM RIBBECK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.