Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Jackling, Joseph M, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Randall Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 23, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 08, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 12, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
August 12, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 04, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
July 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - RANDALL DENNIS |
||
July 09, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM |
||
June 23, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 23, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.