Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Richard Beale, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 18, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 26, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: September 17, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 07, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 26, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 26, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
February 07, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
February 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
January 26, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
January 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
January 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR SOL AFFIRMATION Redacted |
||
January 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.