Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Susan Mccormack, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 27, 2021AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 30, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 03, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 30, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT DEBTSELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 29, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 03, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
November 30, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBTSELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBTSELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
November 30, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
November 30, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 BILL OF SALES Redacted per 22 NYCRR BILL OF SALES Redacted |
||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIG CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIG CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.