Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Linda S. Gillmor, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bonarigo, Benjamin James, against Greg M. Gillmor, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
January 27, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
January 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
January 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
January 27, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
January 18, 2023 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | ||
December 12, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
April 08, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
March 25, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.