Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Premier Genesee Health & Rehabilitation Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Buitrago, Marcelo Alejandro, Kern, Kenneth Michael, against Donna Howard, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: September 28, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
September 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 27, 2021 | Affidavit of Merit | ||
September 27, 2021 | Affidavit of Non Military Status | ||
September 27, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 27, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Additional Mailing pursuant to CPLR 3215 |
||
June 28, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
April 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 25, 2021 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.