Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Velocity Commercial Capital Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lefkowitz, Gary Alan, Ruuska, Ryan E, against Debra A Mazerbo Exr, Equity One Mortgage Company, Internal Revenue Service, Mark Rich, Mazerbo Trust, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ANSWER
Date: February 20, 2020COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 27, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 25, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 18, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 16, 2018CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 27, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 17, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 19, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 16, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 17, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 04, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 04, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 24, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 08, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 17, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 18, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 24, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 08, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 16, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 14, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 13, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 09, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 13, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 13, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 15, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 19, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 18, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 23, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 23, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 30, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 13, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 08, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 21, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 10, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
January 10, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 08, 2021 | Affidavit of service Notice of Conversion | ||
December 08, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 27, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
August 27, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
March 09, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING ADDITIONAL SUMMONS PURSUANT TO CPLR 3215(G)(3)(I) |
||
February 25, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
February 21, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
||
February 20, 2020 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.