Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against Todd Matthew Crnkovich, Todd M Crnkovich, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Charles N Zambito presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles N Zambito Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 26, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY 100151 ssd |
||
August 26, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS & DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
August 26, 2021 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
July 14, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) updated court date |
||
July 12, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) affidavit of mailing (certificate of service) |
||
July 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 12, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Filed by AXS 100151 |
||
July 08, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
July 08, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.