Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Vincent R Syracuse Jr, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Charles N Zambito presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles N Zambito Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2009 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 28, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 26, 2009ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 06, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
July 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION EXPARTE AFFIRMATION |
||
July 01, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 28, 2021 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) ex parte |
||
June 28, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
June 28, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
September 28, 2010 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE MOTION/AFFIRM/AFF/EXHIBITS(STEP OF SETTLEMENT FILED) |
||
September 21, 2010 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT |
||
August 20, 2010 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MOTION SLIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.