Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2016 |
CategoryForeclosure Conf Ineligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time506 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
April 07, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
April 07, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED COLAIACOVO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
March 27, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
March 27, 2017 | Motion |
ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT (Motion #003) Decided: 04/24/2017SG&R (WOODS); (WAS ACTUALLY RE Before Justice: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
March 27, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT APPLICATION COLAIACOVO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
August 12, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
August 12, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT COLAIACOVO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
August 12, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
June 28, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.