Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL F. GRIFFITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL F. GRIFFITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2016 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time423 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
May 20, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
May 20, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED COLAIACOVO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
April 21, 2016 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE (ON SUBMISSION) * (Motion #002) Decided: 05/20/2016SG&R, SASE (FRENKEL) Before Justice: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
April 21, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
January 19, 2016 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE GRISANTI (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
October 13, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) GRISANTI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
October 13, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) GRISANTI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
October 08, 2015 | Motion |
APT REFEREE (Motion #001) Decided: 10/13/2015SG&R SASE (FRENKEL), P.POPE AP Before Justice: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
|
October 08, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) COLAIACOVO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EMILIO L. COLAIACOVO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.