Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Robert C. Noonan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Noonan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time81 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT NOONAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 12, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 01, 2015 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002) Decided: 05/12/2015SG&R SASE (WOODS) Before Justice: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 01, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 01, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
March 09, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
March 06, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
February 20, 2015 | Motion |
ORDER OF REFERENCE (Motion #001) Decided: 03/09/2015SG&R SASE (WOODS), J. BEST APT Before Justice: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
February 20, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.