Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. ROBERT C. NOONAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure Conf Ineligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time101 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT NOONAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 21, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 15, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 07, 2015 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002) Decided: 05/21/2015SG&R SASE (WOODS) SMF FIL Before Justice: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 07, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
March 16, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
February 20, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
February 09, 2015 | Motion |
ORDER OF REFERENCE (Motion #001) Decided: 03/16/2015SG&R SASE (WOODS), M. HETTLER Before Justice: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
February 09, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.