Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Michael Bellinger, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Dunshee, Alexander Warren, against Christie Bellinger, represented by Fallarino-Barber, Veronica Christine, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, NY, . Fulton County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFulton County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 12, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 02, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 27, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
July 26, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 26, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
July 26, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 25, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 24, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.