Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Margarita V Millan, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Sise, Joseph Martin, against Deanna L. Collins-Albicelli, Eileen C Collins, Karen A Collins-Smith, Kevin S Collins, Michael Collins, (total of 5) See All represented by Mcguire, Benjamin Charles, Pfalzer, Matthew David, Stefanides, Kristian Emily, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, NY, . Fulton County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFulton County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 15, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 18, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Prior Motion and Supporting Papers/Responsive papers, etc. |
||
March 11, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 11, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Court Decision and Order-Motion 2 |
||
March 11, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
January 26, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Setting schedule for completion of discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.