Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andrew V. Laporta, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Rhoades, Karen Anne, against Nancy P. Laporta, represented by D'Agostino, Carolyn Aita, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, NY, . Fulton County, NY Superior Courts with Philip V Cortese presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhilip V Cortese Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFulton County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 15, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
November 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
November 15, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
November 09, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
October 07, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
August 20, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 20, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 20, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.