Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
John Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Nichols, Pamela Ann, against Board Of Education Of The Gloversville Enlarged School District, Bryan Buchanan, Gloversville Enlarged School District, represented by Casale, Anthony Salvatore, Fitzgerald, Patrick Joseph, Rubin, Daniel Sidney Lawrence, Watson, Bonnie Rose, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, NY, . Fulton County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Thomas D. Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas D. Buchanan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFulton County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of New York, County of Fulton. The plaintiff, John Doe, is suing the defendants Bryan Buchanan, Gloversville Enlarged School District, and Board of Education of the Gloversville Enlarged S...
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 28, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Letter |
||
September 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Update |
||
August 11, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 11, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
October 08, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 31, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 31, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT of Service effectuating service of Summons and Complaint |
||
August 31, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 24, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.