Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Timebuyer, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Swartz, Eric Thomas, against Jackie Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 01, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 03, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT PARTIALLY SATISFIED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
December 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted |
||
November 24, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
November 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 14, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 01, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.