Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Glens Falls National Bank And Trust Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cullum, James Edward, against Heather M. Gratton, represented by Mccann, Thomas H., in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 25, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: January 28, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
February 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
January 28, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
January 27, 2022 |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
January 27, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 26, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 26, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
January 26, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice, Affidavits of Service and Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.