Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nbt Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Shawn Vaillancourt, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
October 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 14, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SCRA/Non-Military Affidavit |
||
October 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 18, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.